22 Useful Math Hacks And Tricks You Weren’t Taught In School

 / 

,
Useful Math Hacks Tricks

For many people, Mathematics has been an extremely challenging subject. However, these useful Math hacks will guide you! Ready to solve some equations? These math hacks will blow your mind!

These math hacks are something you weren’t taught back in school and I assure you that it’s something you wished you should have known earlier. Life in math class would have been so much at ease.

Maybe maths could have been a favorite subject if these tips and tricks were handy.

22 Amazing Math Hacks And Tricks That You Must Learn

1. All 1’s to a Numeric Palindrome:

10 Super Amazing Math Hacks
22 Useful Math Hacks And Tricks You Weren’t Taught at School

1 x 1 = 1
11 x 11 = 121 
111 x 111 = 12321 
1111 x 1111 = 1234321
11111 x 11111 = 123454321
111111 x 111111 = 12345654321
1111111 x 1111111 = 1234567654321
11111111 x 11111111 = 123456787654321
111111111 x 111111111 = 12345678987654321

2. Through 9 to 9 Through 1:

22 Useful Math Hacks And Tricks You Weren't Taught In School
Amazing Math Hacks And Tricks

1 x 8 + 1 = 9
12 x 8 + 2 = 98
123 x 8 + 3 = 987
1234 x 8 + 4 = 9876
12345 x 8 + 5 = 98765
123456 x 8 + 6 = 987654
1234567 x 8 + 7 = 9876543
12345678 x 8 + 8 = 98765432
123456789 x 8 + 9 = 987654321

3. Sequential Input to All 1’s:

22 Useful Math Hacks And Tricks You Weren't Taught In School
Fast Math Hacks And Tricks

1 x 9 + 2 = 11
12 x 9 + 3 = 111
123 x 9 + 4 = 1111
1234 x 9 + 5 = 11111
12345 x 9 + 6 = 111111
123456 x 9 + 7 = 1111111
1234567 x 9 + 8 = 11111111
12345678 x 9 + 9 = 111111111
123456789 x 9 + 10 = 1111111111

4. Multiply  63 X 11

22 Useful Math Hacks And Tricks You Weren't Taught In School
Best Math Hacks And Tricks

63 x 11 = 693
Step 1 = 63 = 6 () 3
Step 2 = 6+3 = 9
Step 3= 6 (9) 3

5. Multiply 5 digit number with 11

22 Useful Math Hacks And Tricks You Weren't Taught In School
Cool Math Tricks For Doing Maths

13432 x 11 = 147752
Step 1 = 13432 = 1()2
Step 2 = 1+3 = 4
Step 3 = 3+4 = 7
Step 4 = 4+3 = 7
Step 5 = 3+2 = 5
Step 6 = 1(4775)2

6. Multiples of 9

22 Useful Math Hacks And Tricks You Weren't Taught In School
Best Math Tricks For Quick Calculations

Then list the numbers 0 to 9 down the paper and next to that then write the numbers 0 to 9 up the paper. It means you just have to write 0 to 9 in both ascending and descending order in parallel lines. You’ll see in the photo above that this will give you the answer for each multiplying factor x 9!

That’s the order of 9 tables! Look for yourself!

0 9
1 8
2 7
3 6
4 5
5 4
6 3
7 2
8 1
9 0

22 Useful Math Hacks And Tricks You Weren't Taught In School
Amazing Math Tricks For Quick Calculations

7. Easy way to find 97 square

22 Useful Math Hacks And Tricks You Weren't Taught In School
Amazing Math Hacks And Tricks By Number

97 x 97 = 9409
First digit 97 = 100 -3
Second digit 97 – 3 = 94
Now 3 x 3 = 9
Result = 9409

Read This Emotional Intelligence Quiz Reveals How Psychic You Are!

8. Easy fraction 

8 Super Amazing Math Hacks
Genius Math Hacks And Number Tricks

Step 1 = 1/7 + 1/6
Step 2 = (7 + 6) / (7 x 6)
Step 3 = 13/42

9 Turn complex multiplication into simple 

9 Super Amazing Math Hacks
Fun Math Tips And Tricks

56 x 54 = 3024
Step 1 = 5 x (5 + 1) = 30
Step 2 = 6 x 4 = 24
Result = 3024

10. Without 8

10 Super Amazing Math Hacks
Multiplication Tips And Tricks

11. Multiply by 15

22 Useful Math Hacks And Tricks You Weren't Taught In School

34 x 15
Step1: Place one zero after the number = 340
Step 2: Find half of the number = 170
Step 3: Add both numbers = 340+170 = 510

12. Subtracting from 1000

22 Useful Math Hacks And Tricks You Weren't Taught In School

1,000 – 648
Step 1 = 9 – 6 = 3
Step 2 = 9 – 4 = 5
Step 3= 10 – 8 = 2
Result = 352

13. Simple multiplication by 4

22 Useful Math Hacks And Tricks You Weren't Taught In School

The trick here is to multiply your number by 2, and then multiply it by 2 again.

58 x 4 = (58 x 2) + (58 x 2) = 116 +116 = 232

14. Quick square calculation

22 Useful Math Hacks And Tricks You Weren't Taught In School

This trick will help you find the square root of a two-digit number that ends with a five. Multiply the first digit by itself and add 1 to it. Then write 25. That’s it!
For example  – 352
3 x (3 + 1) & 25 
3 x 4 & 25
12 & 25
1225

Read Which Intelligence Is Your Most Dominant? – MIND GAME

15. Sequential Inputs of 9

22 Useful Math Hacks And Tricks You Weren't Taught In School

9 x 9 = 81
99 x 99 = 9801
999 x 999 = 998001
9999 x 9999 = 99980001
99999 x 99999 = 9999800001
999999 x 999999 = 999998000001
9999999 x 9999999 = 99999980000001
99999999 x 99999999 = 9999999800000001
999999999 x 999999999 = 999999998000000001

16. Sequential Inputs of 6

22 Useful Math Hacks And Tricks You Weren't Taught In School

6 x 7 = 42
66 x 67 = 4422
666 x 667 = 444222
6666 x 6667 = 44442222
66666 x 66667 = 4444422222
666666 x 666667 = 444444222222
6666666 x 6666667 = 44444442222222
66666666 x 66666667 = 4444444422222222
666666666 x 666666667 = 444444444222222222

17. Sequential 8’s with 9

22 Useful Math Hacks And Tricks You Weren't Taught In School

9 x 9 + 7 = 88
98 x 9 + 6 = 888
987 x 9 + 5 = 8888
9876 x 9 + 4 = 88888
98765 x 9 + 3 = 888888
987654 x 9 + 2 = 8888888
9876543 x 9 + 1 = 88888888
98765432 x 9 + 0 = 888888888

18. 37 multiplied by multiples of 3 

22 Useful Math Hacks And Tricks You Weren't Taught In School

   37 x 3 =111
   37 x 6 =222
   37 x 9 =333
   37 x12 = 444
   37 x 15 = 555
   37 x 18 = 666
   37 x 21 = 777
   37 x 24 = 888
   37 x 27 = 999

19. Quick multiplication 5

22 Useful Math Hacks And Tricks You Weren't Taught In School

5887 x 5 = (5887/2) & 5 or 0
5887 x 5 = 2943.5 (fraction) & 5
5887 x 5 = 29,435

Divide a given number by 2. If the result is a whole number, add 0 at the end. If the result is not a whole number, ignore the decimal and just add 5 at the end.

20. Easy math trick to calculate tips

22 Useful Math Hacks And Tricks You Weren't Taught In School

If you need to leave 15% of your order as tips at the restaurant, then here is a simple way to do it. First, find 10% of your sum (divide your sum by 10), and then add another half of the result. That’s your tip.

Say 15% of $25
(10% of $25) + (10% of $25)/2
Results = $2.50 + $1.25 = $3.75

Read The Nine different types of intelligence – Which Smart are you ?

21. Division by 5

22 Useful Math Hacks And Tricks You Weren't Taught In School

Dividing large numbers by five is, in fact, pretty simple. All you need to do is multiply your number by 2 and then move the decimal point.

197 /5 = ?
Step 1 = 197 x 2 = 394
Step 2 = 39.4
Results = 39.4

22. How to remember pi value

22 Useful Math Hacks And Tricks You Weren't Taught In School

Pi is 3.1415926 (remembered with the mnemonic “May I have a large container of coffee“). Note that the number of letters in each word is equal to the corresponding digit of pi.

If you found this brilliant Math Hacks then let us know in comments. Also share it with your friends and help them too.

Related video:

Math Hacks
10 Super Amazing Math Hacks You Were Never Taught
Amazing Math Hacks pin
Math Hacks Tricks Werent Taught In School pin
Useful Math Hacks Tricks pin

— Share —

— About the Author —

Falcon kestrel

Responses

  1. John Farmer Avatar
    John Farmer

    does this work with all primary numbers or just with #9?

Leave a Reply

Your email address will not be published. Required fields are marked *